HI SB657 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the scope of practice for chiropractic to reflect standards, practices, and terminology accepted by the National Board of Chiropractic Examiners. Requires Board of Chiropractic Examiners to work with the American Chiropractic Association to define the scope of practice of chiropractic. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB657 HD1)
Title
Chiropractic; Scope of Practice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-04-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1171) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-22-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 151) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 549) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |