HI SB657 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the chief election officer, as of 01/01/2010 from approving a direct recording electronic voting system that does not meet federal qualifications and include an accessible voter verifiable paper audit trail. Establishes requirements for purchase and use of voting systems as of 01/01/2011.
Title
Elections; Electronic Voting System; Verifiable Audit Paper Trail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=657&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB657_.HTM |