HI SB656 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all financial disclosures filed with the commission on judicial conduct to be posted on the Internet by the judiciary. Requires that personal information be redacted prior to posting on the Internet.
Title
Judiciary; Financial Disclosures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=656&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB656_.HTM |