HI SB652 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB652
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Keahole FBO I LLC with planning, designing, constructing, equipping, and operating facilities for aviation services and aviation-related services at Ellison Onizuka Kona International Airport at Keahole. (SB652 HD1)
Title
Relating To Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Keahole Fbo I Llc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:25AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 852). |
2019-04-23 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 666). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2104), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-15-19 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB652 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
HB203 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB203 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2