HI SB646 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB646
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the amount of the rental motor vehicle surcharge tax to an unspecified amount for any county with a resident population of more than 125,000, but less than 195,000. Allocates the increase in surcharge tax revenues to the county's subaccount within the state highway fund. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1423) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 243) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Inouye). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB646 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).