HI SB646 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the installation of clotheslines in any residential dwelling, apartment, condominium, or townhouse, under certain conditions. Defines a reasonable restriction on the placement and use of clotheslines as any restriction that is necessary to protect public health and safety, buildings from damage, historic or aesthetic values, or shorelines under certain circumstances. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Household Energy Demand; Clotheslines; Residential Property; Reasonable Restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-02-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-29 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-29-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cullen, Fukumoto Chang voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1101), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Yamane; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-17-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 168) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Kidani, Kouchi . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Galuteria. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |