HI SB640 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the independent audit of the wireless enhanced 911 fund to be conducted annually rather than biannually. Requires that information on the status of projects undertaken or planned by public safety answering points, and the results of the annual audit, to be included in the wireless enhanced 911 board's annual report to the legislature. Requires the initial annual audit to be conducted in 2011 and its results to be reported to the legislature in 2012. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Wireless Enhanced 911 Fund; Independent Audit; Annual Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-17-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBM, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 645) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from EDT/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDT/PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |