HI SB64 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits an employer from discriminating against a person based on the person's status as a medical cannabis cardholder or a registered qualifying patients' positive test result for cannabis, under certain conditions. Specifies that an employer may use a fit-for-duty test as a tool for medical cannabis qualifying patients in potentially dangerous occupations. Exempts certain occupations. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from LCA/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateRe-Referred to LCA/HTH, JDC.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2021-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback