HI SB633 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows reservists and national guard members in active service who desire to run for office to file nomination papers and take their oaths by mail.
Title
Reservists and National Guardsmen; Nomination Papers and Oaths
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB878 (Same As) 2015-02-26 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=633&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB633_.HTM |