HI SB631 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB631
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes tips or gratuities paid directly to an individual by a customer of the employer and reported or declared to the employer under the definition of income used to calculate payments of child or spousal support.
Title
Relating To Payments Of Support.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB653 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB631 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
SB631 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=631&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB631_.HTM |