HI SB631 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB631
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts tangible and nonperishable gifts received by an elected or appointed official on behalf of the State from gift reporting requirements under the ethics code. Requires the gift to be publicly recorded and maintained as property of the State and allows the gift to remain with the official's state agency or be transferred to the state archives or state foundation on culture and the arts at the end of the official's term. (HB631 HD1)
Title
Relating To Ethics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1187) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-14-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 216) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 718) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB631 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).