HI SB629 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB629

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows primary caregivers, qualifying out-of-state patients, and caregivers of a qualifying out-of-state patient to access the waiting room within a medical cannabis retail dispensary. Clarifies violations related to medical cannabis dispensaries. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-10HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
2022-02-15HousePass First Reading
2022-02-14HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 26) in amended form (SD 2).
2022-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
2022-02-11Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-14-22.
2022-02-11SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2255) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2022-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Lee.
2022-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-03-22 9:25AM; Via Videoconference.
2022-01-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateReported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 168) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:05PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to HTH, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB629 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback