HI SB626 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB626
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOTAX to audit telecommunications companies operating in Hawaii to identify past underpayments of gross receipts taxes and property taxes, if any, dating back to January 1, 1990. Requires all telecommunications carriers that operate in Hawaii to use generally accepted accounting principles in calculating their tax liabilities to the State and counties.
Title
Relating To Taxation Of Telecommunications Carriers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1203 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB626 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
SB626 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=626&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB626_.HTM |