HI SB626 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB626

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOTAX to audit telecommunications companies operating in Hawaii to identify past underpayments of gross receipts taxes and property taxes, if any, dating back to January 1, 1990. Requires all telecommunications carriers that operate in Hawaii to use generally accepted accounting principles in calculating their tax liabilities to the State and counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation Of Telecommunications Carriers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB626 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
HB1203 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback