HI SB623 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the scope of tuition assistance to Hawaii National Guard members attending the University of Hawaii. (SB623 HD1))
Title
National Guard; Tuition Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Re-referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 39 | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting no (0) and Chang, McKelvey, Morita, Takai, Thielen excused (5). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1061) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wakai, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 03-17-09 7:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EBM, HED, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 212) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Galuteria, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from PSM/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 380) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, English, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Sakamoto, Baker, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kokubun, Takamine. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 2:30 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) Re-Referred to PSM/HRE, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to PSM, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB453 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.