HI SB614 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Retroactively exempts from the state income tax, unemployment compensation and pandemic unemployment assistance received from 3/1/2020, to 12/31/2020. Requires the department of taxation to allow taxpayers to credit the state income tax deducted and withheld from their unemployment compensation and pandemic unemployment assistance during that time period against their overall state income tax liability. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12HouseReferred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 23
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-11HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-09SenateDeferred One Day 03-11-21.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 923) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-03-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
2021-03-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback