HI SB612 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the University of Hawaii Promise Program Plus to provide scholarships for the unmet direct cost needs of qualified students enrolled in a bachelor's degree at the University of Hawaii who are (1) graduates of a University of Hawaii community college who received a Hawaii community college promise program scholarship; and (2) enrolled at any University of Hawaii campus. Appropriates funds to establish and implement the program.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Promise Program Plus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB612 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
HB813 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB813 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=612&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB612_.HTM |