HI SB612 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes housekeeping amendment to the Livestock Revitalization Program. Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture for the feed developer grant program and reimbursements to qualified producers for feed costs. Authorizes GO bonds for the planning, designing, and purchasing of a livestock feed mill. (SB612 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, DeCoite Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Thielen. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 467). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1665), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1342) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-22-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 208) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 45) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB612 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 224.
HB483 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB483 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Subjects
Appropriation
Department of Agriculture
GO Bonds ($)
Livestock Revitalization Program
Qualified Feed Developer Grants
Department of Agriculture
GO Bonds ($)
Livestock Revitalization Program
Qualified Feed Developer Grants