HI SB609 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB609
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on PVM with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on PVM with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Homeland Security and Resiliency Council to identify electric grid and other critical infrastructure needs and provide recommendations for enhancing the State's grid and critical infrastructure resiliency. Appropriates funds. (SB609 HD1)
Title
Relating To Critical Infrastructure Resiliency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on PVM with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to PVM. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:35AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-11 | House | Re-referred to EEP, PVM, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to PVM/EEP, FIN , referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 198) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1155) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB609 (Carry Over) 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on PVM with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
HB436 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB436 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Critical Infrastructure Resiliency
Electric Grid
Homeland Security and Resiliency Council
Critical Infrastructure Resiliency
Electric Grid
Homeland Security and Resiliency Council