HI SB602 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes use of the one percent of appropriations for capital improvement projects that is deposited into the State's works of art special fund to support performing arts and recordings of live performances, and acquisition, upkeep, and restoration of works of art for Bishop Museum and Iolani Palace. Takes effect July 1, 2020. (SB602 HD2)
Title
Culture and Arts; Works of Art
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 1:00 PM in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 2:00pm in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 5:00pm in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting rescheduled for 04-29-09 5:00pm in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-09 2:45 PM in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-09 4:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Manahan, Carroll, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Marumoto. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Taniguchi, Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Mizuno, Morita, Sagum, Takai, Ward excused (7). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1719) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishimoto, Wooley. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-08-09 5:00pm in conference room 308. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-04-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-09 3:30pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Bertram, Brower, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Yamane, Ward. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-25-09 9:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HAW with none voting no (0) and Chang, McKelvey, Morita, Takai, Thielen excused (5). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from TCI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1026), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HAW. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committees on TCI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Manahan, Tokioka, Berg, Choy, Evans, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wakai, Wooley. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 03-16-09 8:30 AM in House conference room 312. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to TCI, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 806) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Hee, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from EDT/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 433) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-18-09 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-17-09 11:00 AM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/JGO deferred the measure until 02-13-09 11:00 AM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT-JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-09 2:15 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/JGO, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to JGO/EDT, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |