HI SB584 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 166, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 166, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an extended or hanai family member to act as a co-mortgagor in assisting a qualified resident in securing a mortgage to purchase a dwelling unit from the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Mortgages.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 166, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 166, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 15) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 15). |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Harimoto. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Takumi Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387). |
2017-03-31 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Creagan, Har, Ing, McDermott, McKelvey, Thielen, Tupola excused (8). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1549), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino. |
2017-03-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 203) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 795) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HOU, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB870 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).