HI SB576 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB576

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires reports of official out-of-state and intrastate travel by state employees, officers, or other representatives of state departments or agencies, including the judiciary and University of Hawaii, to be made available for public review on the Comptroller's website. Creates an exception for sensitive personal information. Appropriates moneys. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
2023-03-22HouseReported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1433) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2023-03-16HouseThe committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-16-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-09HouseReferred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 202) in amended form (SD 3).
2023-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 941) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 3).
2023-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM.
2023-02-17SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 608) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referral to WAM.
2023-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Wakai.
2023-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
2023-02-06SenateRe-Referred to GVO, WAM.
2023-02-06SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM.
2023-02-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM.
2023-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai.
2023-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-02-23 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to WAM.
2023-01-20SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB576 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback