HI SB575 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB575
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the composition of the Hawaii Tourism Authority Board of Directors to require at least two members, rather than one, to be appointed by the Governor who shall have knowledge, experience, and expertise in the area of Hawaiian cultural practices.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET/HWN, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB575 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EET/HWN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=575&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB575_.HTM |