HI SB575 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB575
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Legislative Reference Bureau to study various effects that the legalization of marijuana have had on other states. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB575 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=575&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB575_.HTM |