HI SB570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB570
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires individuals to report use tax liabilities on their individual income tax return and remit payments of the use tax with their individual income tax returns, if applicable, or report use tax liabilities on use tax returns and remit payments with the returns. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/19.
Title
Relating To Use Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1241 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB570 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WAM.
SB570 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=570&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB570_.HTM |