HI SB560 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the Workforce Development Division from being directly part of the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to the Workforce Development Council, an entity that is administratively attached to the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations. Takes effect of 7/1/3000. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Labor.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2439) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to LBT. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2228) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to LBT. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella, Lee. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT will hold a public decision making on 02-07-24 3:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to LBT. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB560 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to LBT.