HI SB560 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes ranked-choice voting for special federal elections and special elections of vacant county council seats. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Ranked Choice Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nakashima, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Ward.
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; English.
2021-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2021-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-13SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 461).
2021-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kong, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-09HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1826), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
2021-03-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1497) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-23HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
2021-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 231).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05SenateOne Day Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 830) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-17SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 281) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:30PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback