HI SB559 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Act 032, 06/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the State to expand strategies and mechanisms to reduce greenhouse gas emissions statewide in alignment with the principles and goals adopted in the Paris Agreement. Renames the Interagency Climate Adaptation Committee as the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission. Clarifies the duties of the Commission. Repeals the Commission effective 7/1/2022. Makes appropriations for purposes of this Act and a climate change mitigation and adaptation coordinator position. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Climate Change.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateAct 032, 06/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
2017-06-08HouseAct 032, on 06/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101).
2017-04-28HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2017-04-28SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
2017-04-28SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:15PM in conference room 224.
2017-04-28SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 12:30PM in conference room 224.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:00AM in conference room 224.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 11:00AM in conference room 224.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 11:00AM in conference room 224.
2017-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 11:00AM in conference room 224.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Kim, Inouye, English Co-Chairs.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Yamane, Lowen Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2017-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677).
2017-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-13SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2017-04-11HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-07HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17.
2017-04-07HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1736) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola.
2017-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-03-24HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
2017-03-24HouseReported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1340) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-03-23HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
2017-03-23HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
2017-03-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 03-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 199) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Wakai.
2017-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:40AM in conference room 211.
2017-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2017-02-17SenateReported from AEN/GVO/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 423) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2017-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Tokuda.
2017-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2017-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/GVO/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 10:10AM in conference room 414.
2017-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/GVO/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2017-01-27SenateRe-Referred to AEN/GVO/TRE, WAM.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to AEN/GVO, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback