HI SB559 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of accounting and general services to establish by 01/01/11 a mandatory recycling program for all state buildings and facilities over which the department has authority. (SD2)
Title
Recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 193) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Hee, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Reported from ENE/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser, Ihara, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Bunda, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-17-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE-JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-09 9:00am in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Re-Referred to ENE/JGO, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |