HI SB553 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB553
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the broadband service infrastructure grant program to award grants to applicants to extend deployment of facilities used to provide broadband service to unserved and underserved areas of the State. Makes an appropriation. (SB553 HD2)
Title
Relating To Broadband Service Infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1605) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from EDB/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1360) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/IAC on Wednesday, 03-13-19 9:40AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 184) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPH. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TEC/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPH. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to TEC/EET, WAM/CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TEC/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1156 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB553 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
SB553 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).