HI SB553 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB553

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the broadband service infrastructure grant program to award grants to applicants to extend deployment of facilities used to provide broadband service to unserved and underserved areas of the State. Makes an appropriation. (SB553 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband Service Infrastructure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1605) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno.
2019-03-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from EDB/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1360) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-13HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott.
2019-03-13HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB/IAC on Wednesday, 03-13-19 9:40AM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to EDB/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 184) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPH.
2019-02-14SenateReported from TEC/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPH.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on TEC/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-28SenateRe-Referred to TEC/EET, WAM/CPH.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to TEC/EET, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1156 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB553 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback