HI SB550 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB550

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows an individual who is seventeen years of age but will be eighteen years of age on or before the next general election to register and vote at the primary election immediately preceding that general election and in any co-occurring or intervening special election. Takes effect upon ratification of an appropriate constitutional amendment. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 229) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 704) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-10-21 9:10AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB550 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback