HI SB549 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 138, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires restaurants that sell children's meals that include a beverage to make the default beverage a healthy beverage. (SB549 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Healthy Beverages For Children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateAct 138, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
2019-06-28HouseAct 138, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 914).
2019-04-18SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Ihara, Kim, Moriwaki . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-05-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 582).
2019-04-04HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, Okimoto, Onishi, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-19.
2019-04-02HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1939) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1699) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tokioka.
2019-03-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 9:15AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HMS, CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB359 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback