HI SB548 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB548

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Legalizes the personal use, possession, and sale of marijuana in a specified quantity. Requires licensing to operate marijuana establishments. Subjects marijuana establishments to excise taxes and income taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17SenateRe-Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-27SenateRe-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB548 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback