HI SB546 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the environmental response, energy, and food security tax to address carbon emissions. Increases the tax rate to effectively set a price of $40 per metric ton of carbon dioxide emissions in 2022. Incrementally increases the tax rate over time so that, in 2032, the tax rate shall be equivalent to a carbon price of $80 per metric ton of carbon emissions. Establishes a refundable tax credit for lower-income individuals. Tax credit applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021. Takes effect 1/1/2022.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB546 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AEN/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=546&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB546_.HTM |