HI SB543 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB543

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a statewide coordinator and program within the department of the attorney general to provide services and assistance to sexually exploited children and victims of human trafficking. Requires the attorney general to submit reports to the legislature. Requires the children's justice program to coordinate the investigation and case management of human trafficking cases, including cases involving the sexual exploitation of children. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Human Trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-17SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 299) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-02-01SenateRe-Referred to HMS, WAM/JDC.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB722 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB543 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback