HI SB542 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB542
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to article X, section 1, of the Hawaii State Constitution to require that the statewide public school system be thorough and efficient.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article X, Section 1, Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Require That The Statewide Public School System Be Thorough And Efficient.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB542 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
HB690 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
HB690 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=542&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB542_.HTM |