HI SB539 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB539

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes intentionally or knowingly causing bodily injury to certain health care facility workers a Class C felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health Care Workers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB676 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB539 (Carry Over) 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback