HI SB539 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB539
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes intentionally or knowingly causing bodily injury to certain health care facility workers a Class C felony.
Title
Relating To Health Care Workers.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB676 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Referred to CPH, JDC.
SB539 (Carry Over) 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
SB539 (Carry Over) 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=539&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB539_.HTM |