HI SB537 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB537

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes American Sign Language as a fully developed, autonomous, natural language with its own grammar, syntax, vocabulary, and cultural heritage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To American Sign Language.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to CAI, JHA, CPC, referral sheet 21
2021-03-09HousePass First Reading
2021-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 99).
2021-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-18SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB840 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB537 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback