HI SB537 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Transitions from lump sum deferred deposit transactions to installment-based small dollar loan transactions. Specifies various consumer protection requirements for small dollar loans. Beginning 1/1/2020, requires licensure for small dollar lenders that offer small dollar loans to consumers. Specifies licensing requirements for small dollar lenders. Authorizes the division of financial institutions to appoint 2.0 FTE examiner positions, funded via the compliance resolution fund, to carry out the purposes of the small dollar installment loan program. Requires check cashers to be registered with DCCA and to offer a voluntary payment plan to customers under certain circumstances. Establishes the terms of voluntary payment plans. Clarifies that a customer may only have one outstanding deferred deposit transaction from any source. Amends notices to customers required of check cashers. Removes the exemption for persons engaged in the bona fide retail sale of goods or services. Requires the Auditor to conduct a sunrise analysis of the regulation of payday lenders and deferred deposit agreements in the State. (SB537 HD3)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
2019-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 741).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2190) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1594) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1367) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-11HouseRe-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 177) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1068) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB79 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback