HI SB533 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes voters with special needs advisory committees at the state and county levels to ensure equal and independent access to voter registration, casting of ballots, and all other office of elections services.
Title
Relating To Voters With Special Needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB737 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB533 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HMS, JDC.
SB533 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HMS, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=533&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB533_.HTM |