HI SB532 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB532

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Part I: Requires a law enforcement officer who observes criminal misconduct by another law enforcement officer to report the criminal misconduct. Requires passage of a psychological screening test battery to qualify for appointment as a law enforcement officer. Subjects a law enforcement officer to denial, suspension, or revocation of a law enforcement officer's certification for failure to report observed criminal misconduct or committing an act of criminal misconduct. Part II: Prohibits the use of a chokehold by a law enforcement officer unless the use of deadly force is justifiable. Defines chokehold.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Law Enforcement Reform.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-01SenateRe-Referred to JDC.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB428 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB532 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Re-Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback