HI SB532 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 249, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 249, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain employers to provide reasonable time and private location for breastfeeding employees to express breast milk. Requires covered employers to post a notice. Establishes a civil fine for each violation. (CD1)
Title
Breastfeeding; Workplace Accommodation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act 249, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352). |
2013-07-09 | House | Act 249, on 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman, Tokioka voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 168) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 168). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Rhoads, Hashem, Ichiyama, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ige, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 711). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Rhoads, Hashem Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Johanson. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 532). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1598), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1139), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 976) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-12-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 163) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB409 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3