HI SB531 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB531

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes financial exploitation of a vulnerable adult by a caregiver a Class A felony. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-29SenateRe-Referred to CPH/HMS, JDC.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB691 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB531 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback