HI SB530 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of renewable portfolio standard for electric utility companies to be a percentage of electrical energy generation, rather than sales. Defines a renewable portfolio standard for gas utility companies. Requires gas utility companies to establish renewable energy portfolio standards and provides a means for gas utility companies to achieve the renewable energy portfolio standards.
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB530 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
HB1143 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HB1143 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=530&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB530_.HTM |