HI SB529 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB529

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Human Services and the Department of Health to contract the services of dedicated capture managers responsible for securing grant and other funding opportunities for each department. Authorizes the Department of Human Services and the Department of Health to establish a three-year full time temporary exempt position to support the grant development program. Appropriates funds. Repeals 6/30/2022. (SB529 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Human Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 172) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-29SenateRe-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB660 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB529 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback