HI SB529 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB529
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Human Services and the Department of Health to contract the services of dedicated capture managers responsible for securing grant and other funding opportunities for each department. Authorizes the Department of Human Services and the Department of Health to establish a three-year full time temporary exempt position to support the grant development program. Appropriates funds. Repeals 6/30/2022. (SB529 HD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 172) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB660 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB529 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
SB529 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).