HI SB528 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the department of health for the kupuna care program.
Title
Relating To Aging.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB608 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB528 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB528 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=528&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB528_.HTM |