HI SB524 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of human resources development, in consultation with the Hawaii climate change mitigation and adaptation commission, state energy office, and department of accounting and general services to develop and implement a comprehensive commuting choice benefit program for all state employees regardless of mode of transportation.
Title
Relating To Commuting.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA/TRS, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB524 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA/TRS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=524&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB524_.HTM |